AR HB1548 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Notification that HB1548 is now Act 571
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Notification that HB1548 is now Act 571
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Create The Personal Care Medicaid Reimbursement Act; And To Ensure An Appropriate Reimbursement Rate For Personal Care Services In The Arkansas Medicaid Program.
Title
To Create The Personal Care Medicaid Reimbursement Act; And To Ensure An Appropriate Reimbursement Rate For Personal Care Services In The Arkansas Medicaid Program.
Sponsors
Sen. Clint Penzo [R] | Sen. Kim Hammer [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-05 | House | Notification that HB1548 is now Act 571 |
2021-03-31 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-03-30 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-03-30 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2021-03-29 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Re-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-16 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-03-15 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-11 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-11 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-11 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-09 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2021-02-23 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-02-23 | House | Filed |