AR HB1547 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 46-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Notification that HB1547 is now Act 977
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 46-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Notification that HB1547 is now Act 977
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Prohibit The State From Mandating A Vaccine Or Immunization For Coronavirus 2019 (covid-19); To Govern Requirements For A Vaccine Or Immunization For Coronavirus 2019 (covid-19); And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Prohibit The State From Mandating A Vaccine Or Immunization For Coronavirus 2019 (covid-19); To Govern Requirements For A Vaccine Or Immunization For Coronavirus 2019 (covid-19); And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - Senate - EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | House | Notification that HB1547 is now Act 977 |
2021-04-22 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-04-21 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-04-21 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Motion to Expunge the Vote by which the Emergency Clause failed of adoption. Motion passed. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Emergency Clause failed of adoption. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-04-14 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-04-14 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-13 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-04-12 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-12 | House | Amendment No. 4 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-12 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-29 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-29 | House | Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-29 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-17 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-17 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-15 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-15 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-15 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-02-23 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-02-23 | House | Filed |