AR HB1544 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Notification that HB1544 is now Act 392
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Affirm The Right Of A Municipality To Declare The Municipality A Pro-life City.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Affirm The Right Of A Municipality To Declare The Municipality A Pro-life City.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 16 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-17HouseNotification that HB1544 is now Act 392
2021-03-16HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2021-03-15HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2021-03-15HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2021-03-15SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2021-03-15SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-03-11SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-03-02SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-03-02SenateReceived from the House.
2021-03-02HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-03-01HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-02-23HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-02-23HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback