AR HB1522 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Notification that HB1522 is now Act 462
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law To Extend State Benefits To The Members Of The Arkansas National Guard On State Active Duty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law To Extend State Benefits To The Members Of The Arkansas National Guard On State Active Duty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13HouseNotification that HB1522 is now Act 462
2019-03-12HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-03-11HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-03-11HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-03-11SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2019-03-11SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-07SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-05SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-03-05SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-04HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-02-27HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-02-20HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2019-02-20HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback