AR HB1521 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Establish Rules To Improve Contracting And Service Delivery Of Medicaid Nonemergency Transportation And To Ensure Compliance With Federal Regulations.
Title
To Establish Rules To Improve Contracting And Service Delivery Of Medicaid Nonemergency Transportation And To Ensure Compliance With Federal Regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-04-02 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-04-01 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-04-01 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-04-01 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-03-29 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2019-02-20 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2019-02-20 | House | Filed |