AR HB1508 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Notification that HB1508 is now Act 1014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Notification that HB1508 is now Act 1014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning Riot Offenses And Public Demonstration Offenses; Concerning Offenses Committed Against First Responders; Concerning Public And Private Property Offenses; And Concerning Procedures Upon Arrest.
Title
Concerning Riot Offenses And Public Demonstration Offenses; Concerning Offenses Committed Against First Responders; Concerning Public And Private Property Offenses; And Concerning Procedures Upon Arrest.
Sponsors
Rep. Karilyn Brown [R] | Sen. Alan Clark [R] | Rep. Mark Lowery [R] | Rep. Craig Christiansen [R] |
Rep. Stan Berry [R] | Rep. Mary Bentley [R] | Rep. Harlan Breaux [R] | Rep. Joe Cloud [R] |
Rep. Bruce Coleman [R] | Rep. Cindy Crawford [R] | Rep. Brian Evans [R] | Rep. Steve Hollowell [R] |
Rep. Rick McClure [R] | Rep. Stephen Meeks [R] | Rep. Johnny Rye [R] | Rep. Keith Slape [R] |
Rep. Brandt Smith [R] | Rep. Stu Smith [R] | Rep. Jim Wooten [R] | Sen. Joshua Bryant [R] |
Rep. Danny Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | Notification that HB1508 is now Act 1014 |
2021-04-23 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-04-22 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-04-22 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-04-19 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-19 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-19 | House | Amendment No. 5 & 6 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-19 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-04-15 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 5 & 6 |
2021-04-12 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-12 | House | Amendment No. 4 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-12 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-15 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-15 | House | Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-15 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-09 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-09 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-09 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-08 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-08 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-08 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-02-22 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-02-22 | House | Filed |