AR HB1497 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Notification that HB1497 is now Act 824
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Notification that HB1497 is now Act 824
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding The Permitted Use Of A Certified Facility Dog For Vulnerable Witnesses.
Title
Expanding The Permitted Use Of A Certified Facility Dog For Vulnerable Witnesses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - Third Reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - Third Reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | House | Notification that HB1497 is now Act 824 |
2021-04-20 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-04-19 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-04-19 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-03-16 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-15 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-15 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-15 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-11 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2021-02-10 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed |