AR HB1497 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Notification that HB1497 is now Act 518
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Creating Civil Immunity For Owners Of Stolen Agricultural Equipment Or An Off-road Vehicle When An Offense Is Committed By Another Person Who Steals The Owner's Agricultural Equipment Or Other Off-road Vehicle.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating Civil Immunity For Owners Of Stolen Agricultural Equipment Or An Off-road Vehicle When An Offense Is Committed By Another Person Who Steals The Owner's Agricultural Equipment Or Other Off-road Vehicle.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19HouseNotification that HB1497 is now Act 518
2019-03-14HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-03-13HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-03-13HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-03-13SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2019-03-13SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-12SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-05SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-03-05SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-04HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-02-28HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-02-21HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-21HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-02-21HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-02-18HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-02-18HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback