AR HB1488 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Concerning The Adoption Process When A Licensed Child Placement Agency Is Not Used; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Concerning The Adoption Process When A Licensed Child Placement Agency Is Not Used; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 68 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateSine Die adjournment
2019-04-24SenateDied in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
2019-03-14SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-03-14SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-14HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-03-14HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-02-21HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-21HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-02-21HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-02-20HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2019-02-18HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2019-02-15HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback