AR HB1486 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on April 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-10 - Notification that HB1486 is now Act 1048
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on April 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-10 - Notification that HB1486 is now Act 1048
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Provide Incentives For Working Persons With Disabilities To Remain In The Workforce; And To Remove The Earned Income Limit On Medicaid Eligibility For Working Persons With Disabilities.
Title
To Provide Incentives For Working Persons With Disabilities To Remain In The Workforce; And To Remove The Earned Income Limit On Medicaid Eligibility For Working Persons With Disabilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Josh Miller [R] | Sen. Missy Irvin [R] | Rep. Jonathan Barnett [R] | Rep. Charles Collins [R] |
Rep. Dan Douglas [R] | Rep. Andy Davis [R] | Sen. Jim Dotson [R] | Rep. Joe Farrer [R] |
Sen. Kim Hammer [R] | Rep. Mike Holcomb [R] | Rep. Patti Julian [D] | Rep. Sheilla Lampkin [D] |
Rep. Andrea Lea [R] | Sen. John Payton [R] | Rep. Warwick Sabin [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-08 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-10 | House | Notification that HB1486 is now Act 1048 |
2013-04-08 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-04-08 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-04-08 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2013-04-05 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 |
2013-03-28 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-03-28 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-03-06 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-02-28 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-02-26 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-02-26 | House | Filed |