AR HB1484 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Revise And Simplify The Minimum Liability Insurance Law For Motor Vehicles And The Law Related To The Removal Of Unattended And Abandoned Vehicles.
Title
To Revise And Simplify The Minimum Liability Insurance Law For Motor Vehicles And The Law Related To The Removal Of Unattended And Abandoned Vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-17 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Senate Sine Die adjournment | |
2011-04-27 | Senate Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. | |
2011-03-28 | Senate Re-referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology and Legislative Affairs | |
2011-03-24 | Senate Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 | |
2011-03-17 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology and Legislative Affairs | |
2011-03-17 | Senate Received from the House. | |
2011-03-17 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-03-16 | House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-16 | House Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-16 | House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. | |
2011-03-15 | House Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2 | |
2011-03-14 | House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-14 | House Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-14 | House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. | |
2011-02-22 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE | |
2011-02-22 | House Filed |