AR HB1460 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Notification that HB1460 is now Act 1013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Concerning Unopposed Candidates; And To Require Unopposed Candidates To Appear On The Ballot.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Concerning Unopposed Candidates; And To Require Unopposed Candidates To Appear On The Ballot.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 87 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 67 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15HouseNotification that HB1460 is now Act 1013
2019-04-10HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-04-10HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-04-10HouseSenate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2019-04-09HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
2019-04-08HouseRe-referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2019-04-08HouseReturned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2019-04-08SenateReturned To the House as passed as amended.
2019-04-08SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-05SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-04-05SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-04-05SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-04-04SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2019-03-11SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-03-11SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-11HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-07HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-07HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-07HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-06HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2019-02-14HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2019-02-13HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback