AR HB1455 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Notification that HB1455 is now Act 398
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Notification that HB1455 is now Act 398
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Make A Technical Correction To § 7-5-202; And To Amend The Law Concerning Printouts From Voting Machines.
Title
To Make A Technical Correction To § 7-5-202; And To Amend The Law Concerning Printouts From Voting Machines.
Sponsors
Sen. Justin Boyd [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | House | Notification that HB1455 is now Act 398 |
2019-03-07 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-03-06 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-03-06 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-02-25 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-02-20 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-02-14 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed |