AR HB1447 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Died in the House at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Died in the House at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Mechanism By Which School Nurses Are Compensated.
Title
To Amend The Mechanism By Which School Nurses Are Compensated.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-03 - House - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 28 NV: 29 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Died in the House at Sine Die Adjournment |
2023-04-03 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2023-03-30 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-03-09 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-03-09 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2023-03-09 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2023-02-16 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2023-02-16 | House | Filed |