AR HB1443 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Notification that HB1443 is now Act 830
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Notification that HB1443 is now Act 830
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning Rural Development Authorities And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning Rural Development Authorities And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | House | Notification that HB1443 is now Act 830 |
2019-04-05 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-04-04 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-04-04 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 |
2019-04-01 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-04-01 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Re-referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-03-25 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-03-11 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2019-03-11 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-03-07 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-07 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-07 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-03-06 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2019-03-04 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-02-27 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-02-13 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed |