AR HB1440 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Notification that HB1440 is now Act 829
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Establish The Maternal Mortality Review Committee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Establish The Maternal Mortality Review Committee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09HouseNotification that HB1440 is now Act 829
2019-04-05HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-04-05HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-04-05HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-04-04SenateReturned to the House as Passed.
2019-04-04SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-03SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-05SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-03-05SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-04HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-02-26HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-02-20HouseRe-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-02-20HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-20HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-02-20HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-02-18HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-18HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-02-18HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-02-14HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2019-02-13HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-02-12HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback