AR HB1427 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-20 - Notification that HB1427 is now Act 580
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-20 - Notification that HB1427 is now Act 580
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Adopt Recent Changes To The Internal Revenue Code; To Amend The Arkansas Tax-deferred Tuition Savings Program; And To Make Technical Corrections To The Income Tax Laws.
Title
To Adopt Recent Changes To The Internal Revenue Code; To Amend The Arkansas Tax-deferred Tuition Savings Program; And To Make Technical Corrections To The Income Tax Laws.
Sponsors
Rep. Logan Jett [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-17 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-20 | House | Notification that HB1427 is now Act 580 |
2015-03-18 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2015-03-17 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2015-03-17 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2015-02-26 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-02-24 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-02-23 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2015-02-23 | House | Filed |