AR HB1420 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-04 - House Notification that HB1420 is now Act 193
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-04 - House Notification that HB1420 is now Act 193
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Allow A Grandparent Or A Sibling Over Eighteen (18) Years Of Age To Accompany A Child Of Five (5) To Thirteen (13) Years Of Age To Obtain An Identification Card.
Title
To Allow A Grandparent Or A Sibling Over Eighteen (18) Years Of Age To Accompany A Child Of Five (5) To Thirteen (13) Years Of Age To Obtain An Identification Card.
Sponsors
Rep. John Vines [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-04 | House Notification that HB1420 is now Act 193 | |
2011-03-02 | House Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. | |
2011-03-01 | House TO BE ENROLLED | |
2011-03-01 | House Returned From the Senate as passed. | |
2011-03-01 | Senate Returned to the House as passed. | |
2011-03-01 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-02-28 | Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | |
2011-02-24 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology and Legislative Affairs | |
2011-02-24 | Senate Received from the House. | |
2011-02-24 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-02-23 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-02-15 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE | |
2011-02-15 | House Filed |