AR HB1410 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-06 - Notification that HB1410 is now Act 195
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-06 - Notification that HB1410 is now Act 195
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Revise The Child Labor Laws; And To Create The "youth Hiring Act Of 2023".
Title
To Revise The Child Labor Laws; And To Create The "youth Hiring Act Of 2023".
Sponsors
Rep. Rebecca Burkes [R] | Sen. Clint Penzo [R] | Rep. Kendon Underwood [R] | Rep. Wayne Long [R] |
Rep. Jill Bryant [R] | Sen. Matt McKee [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 32 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 32 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-06 | House | Notification that HB1410 is now Act 195 |
2023-03-02 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2023-03-02 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2023-03-02 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Motion for Immediate Consideration. Motion carried. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2023-02-22 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-02-21 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-02-20 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-02-20 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2023-02-20 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2023-02-13 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2023-02-13 | House | Filed |