AR HB1407 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Require Certain Persons To Report To Law Enforcement Knowledge That Another Person Is In Possession Of Child Pornography On A Computer And To Provide For Immunity From Civil Liability.
Title
To Require Certain Persons To Report To Law Enforcement Knowledge That Another Person Is In Possession Of Child Pornography On A Computer And To Provide For Immunity From Civil Liability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-30 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 81 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Senate Sine Die adjournment | |
2011-04-27 | Senate Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Received from the House. | |
2011-03-30 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-03-30 | House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-30 | House Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-30 | House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. | |
2011-03-29 | House Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 | |
2011-02-15 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE | |
2011-02-15 | House Filed |