AR HB1381 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-31 - Notification that HB1381 is now Act 832
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Repeal Provisions Of State Law That Require Testing Of Home-schooled Students.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Repeal Provisions Of State Law That Require Testing Of Home-schooled Students.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-24 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 74 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-31HouseNotification that HB1381 is now Act 832
2015-03-25HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2015-03-24HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2015-03-24HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2015-03-24SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2015-03-24SenateRead the third time and passed.
2015-03-23SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2015-03-09SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education
2015-03-09SenateReceived from the House.
2015-03-09HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2015-03-05HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2015-02-26HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2015-02-26HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2015-02-26HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2015-02-23HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2015-02-23HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2015-02-23HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2015-02-17HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2015-02-13HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback