AR HB1334 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Create The Restroom Access Act; And To Allow Restroom Access To Customers With Certain Eligible Medical Conditions.
Title
To Create The Restroom Access Act; And To Allow Restroom Access To Customers With Certain Eligible Medical Conditions.
Sponsors
Rep. Tara Shephard [D] | Sen. Linda Chesterfield [D] | Rep. Fred Allen [D] | Rep. Denise Ennett [D] |
Rep. Aaron Pilkington [R] | Rep. Jamie Scott [D] | Rep. Joy Springer [D] | Rep. Matt Duffield [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-14 - House - Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 14 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2023-02-14 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-02-13 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-02-13 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2023-02-13 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2023-02-09 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2023-01-31 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2023-01-31 | House | Filed |