AR HB1321 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Notification that HB1321 is now Act 712
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Notification that HB1321 is now Act 712
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning Offenses Committed Against Critical Infrastructure.
Title
Concerning Offenses Committed Against Critical Infrastructure.
Sponsors
Rep. Jimmie Gazaway [R] | Sen. Alan Clark [R] | Sen. Justin Boyd [R] | Sen. Joshua Bryant [R] |
Rep. Joe Cloud [R] | Rep. Carol Dalby [R] | Rep. Lanny Fite [R] | Rep. Michelle Gray [R] |
Rep. Delia Haak [R] | Rep. Spencer Hawks [R] | Rep. David Hillman [R] | Rep. Lane Jean [R] |
Rep. Lee Johnson [R] | Rep. Julie Mayberry [R] | Rep. Austin Mccollum [R] | Rep. David Ray [R] |
Rep. Kendon Underwood [R] | Sen. Bart Hester [R] | Sen. Jason Rapert [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - Third Reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - Third Reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-14 | House | Notification that HB1321 is now Act 712 |
2021-04-13 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-04-12 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-04-12 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2021-04-08 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 |
2021-04-01 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-04-01 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Re-referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-16 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-03-09 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-08 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-08 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-08 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-04 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2021-02-25 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-02-25 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-02-25 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-01-27 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-01-27 | House | Filed |