AR HB1296 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Notification that HB1296 is now Act 250
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Create The Keep Arkansans Working Act Of 2019; And To Ensure That Default Or Delinquent Student Loans Or Scholarships Do Not Result In Suspension Or Revocation Of A License.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create The Keep Arkansans Working Act Of 2019; And To Ensure That Default Or Delinquent Student Loans Or Scholarships Do Not Result In Suspension Or Revocation Of A License.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28HouseNotification that HB1296 is now Act 250
2019-02-26HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-02-25HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-02-25HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-02-25SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2019-02-25SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-02-18SenateThe vote by which HB1296 Failed to Pass was expunged.
2019-02-18SenateEXPUNGED
2019-02-18SenateRead the third time and failed.
2019-02-18SenateRules suspended.
2019-02-13SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-02-06SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-02-06SenateReceived from the House.
2019-02-06HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-02-04HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-04HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-02-04HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-01-31HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2019-01-30HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-01-29HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback