AR HB1295 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

To Establish The Every Arkansan Retirement Plan Opportunity Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Establish The Every Arkansan Retirement Plan Opportunity Act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10HouseRecommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT
2019-04-10HouseWITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR
2019-03-18HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-18HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-18HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-14HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT
2019-03-14HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-14HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-14HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-01-29HouseIn accordance with House Rule 39 Read the first time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE JOURNAL; ENGROSSED AND ENROLLED BILLS
2019-01-29HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback