AR HB1283 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - Notification that HB1283 is now Act 466
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - Notification that HB1283 is now Act 466
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Protect A Last Vote; To Allow A Vote Cast By Absentee Ballot Before The Death Of A Voter To Be Counted; And To Repeal A Portion Of The Absentee Ballot Law.
Title
To Protect A Last Vote; To Allow A Vote Cast By Absentee Ballot Before The Death Of A Voter To Be Counted; And To Repeal A Portion Of The Absentee Ballot Law.
Sponsors
Rep. Douglas House [R] | Rep. Robert Altes [R] | Rep. Andy Davis [R] | Rep. Jeremy Gillam [R] |
Rep. Bill Gossage [R] | Rep. John Burris [R] | Rep. Allen Kerr [R] | Rep. Andrea Lea [R] |
Sen. Greg Leding [D] | Rep. Jim Nickels [D] | Rep. Warwick Sabin [D] | Rep. Mary L. Slinkard [R] |
Rep. Jeff Wardlaw [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-18 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | House | Notification that HB1283 is now Act 466 |
2013-03-19 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-03-18 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-03-18 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2013-03-15 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 |
2013-03-12 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2013-03-12 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-02-25 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-02-22 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-02-20 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-02-20 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-02-20 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-02-08 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2013-02-08 | House | Filed |