AR HB1221 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Notification that HB1221 is now Act 665
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Notification that HB1221 is now Act 665
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning The Sales And Use Tax Exemption For Sales By A Charitable Organization.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning The Sales And Use Tax Exemption For Sales By A Charitable Organization.
Sponsors
Rep. Warwick Sabin [D] | Rep. Monte Hodges [D] | Rep. Chris Richey [D] | Rep. Matthew Shepherd [R] |
Rep. Les Warren [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | House | Notification that HB1221 is now Act 665 |
2017-03-22 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-03-21 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-03-21 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-03-15 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-14 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-01-19 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2017-01-18 | House | Filed |