AR HB1215 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - Notification that HB1215 is now Act 530
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - Notification that HB1215 is now Act 530
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Laws Regarding The Practice Of Massage Therapy To Include The Practice Of Cupping.
Title
To Amend The Laws Regarding The Practice Of Massage Therapy To Include The Practice Of Cupping.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | House | Notification that HB1215 is now Act 530 |
2017-03-14 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-03-13 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-03-13 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-02-24 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-02-23 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-01-19 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-01-18 | House | Filed |