AR HB1210 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-06 - Notification that HB1210 is now Act 191
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-06 - Notification that HB1210 is now Act 191
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Tax Credit For The Support Of A Child With A Developmental Disability; And To Remove The Requirement For Recertification Of A Developmental Disability That Is Expected To Continue Indefinitely.
Title
To Amend The Tax Credit For The Support Of A Child With A Developmental Disability; And To Remove The Requirement For Recertification Of A Developmental Disability That Is Expected To Continue Indefinitely.
Sponsors
Rep. Delia Haak [R] | Sen. Clint Penzo [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - Third Reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - Third Reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-06 | House | Notification that HB1210 is now Act 191 |
2023-03-02 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2023-03-02 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2023-03-02 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2023-02-08 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-02-07 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-01-24 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2023-01-24 | House | Filed |