AR HB1209 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-15 - Notification that HB1209 is now Act 362
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-15 - Notification that HB1209 is now Act 362
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Create The Elective Pass-through Entity Tax Act; To Impose A Tax On Pass-through Entities; And To Exclude Certain Income From Gross Income For Pass-through Entities.
Title
To Create The Elective Pass-through Entity Tax Act; To Impose A Tax On Pass-through Entities; And To Exclude Certain Income From Gross Income For Pass-through Entities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - Third Reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - Third Reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | House | Notification that HB1209 is now Act 362 |
2021-03-12 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-03-11 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-03-11 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-03-09 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-04 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-03-03 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-03 | House | Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-01 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-01 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-01 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-02-24 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-02-24 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-01-19 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2021-01-19 | House | Filed |