AR HB1206 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Concerning The Authority Of The Board Of Trustees To Award An Annual Cost Of Living Adjustment Under The Arkansas Teacher Retirement System; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Concerning The Authority Of The Board Of Trustees To Award An Annual Cost Of Living Adjustment Under The Arkansas Teacher Retirement System; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27HouseWITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR
2019-02-08HouseIn accordance with House Rule 39 Read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT
2019-02-07HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-07HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-02-07HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-01-22HouseIn accordance with House Rule 39 Read the first time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE JOURNAL; ENGROSSED AND ENROLLED BILLS
2019-01-17HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback