AR HB1201 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-25 - Notification that HB1201 is now Act 692
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-25 - Notification that HB1201 is now Act 692
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Provide Qualified Manufacturers Of Steel With Alternate Qualification Standards And An Extended Carry-forward Period For The Income Tax Credit Allowed For Waste Reduction, Reuse, Or Recycling Equipment.
Title
To Provide Qualified Manufacturers Of Steel With Alternate Qualification Standards And An Extended Carry-forward Period For The Income Tax Credit Allowed For Waste Reduction, Reuse, Or Recycling Equipment.
Sponsors
Rep. Logan Jett [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-25 | House | Notification that HB1201 is now Act 692 |
2015-03-20 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2015-03-19 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2015-03-19 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2015-02-06 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-02-04 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-02-04 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-02-04 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-02-03 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2015-01-29 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2015-01-29 | House | Filed |