AR HB1187 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-11 - Notification that HB1187 is now Act 312
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-11 - Notification that HB1187 is now Act 312
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Arkansas Law Concerning The Use Of Public Funds To Support Or Oppose Ballot Measures.
Title
To Amend Arkansas Law Concerning The Use Of Public Funds To Support Or Oppose Ballot Measures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-06 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 79 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 79 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-11 | House | Notification that HB1187 is now Act 312 |
2013-03-07 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-03-06 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-03-06 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-02-18 | House | CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED |
2013-02-18 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-02-15 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-02-14 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-02-14 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-02-14 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-01-28 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2013-01-28 | House | Filed |