AR HB1177 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Notification that HB1177 is now Act 516
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Protect Employees From Forced Human Microchip Implantation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Protect Employees From Forced Human Microchip Implantation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 84 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19HouseNotification that HB1177 is now Act 516
2019-03-14HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-03-14HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-03-14HouseSenate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2019-03-12HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
2019-03-11HouseRe-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-03-11HouseReturned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2019-03-11SenateReturned To the House as passed as amended.
2019-03-11SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-07SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-07SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-03-06SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2019-01-24SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-01-24SenateReceived from the House.
2019-01-24HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-01-22HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-01-16HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-01-16HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback