AR HB1163 | 2012 | 88th General Assembly Fiscal

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-05 - House Notification that HB1163 is now Act 287
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Amend The Arkansas Revenue Stabilization Law Of Arkansas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend The Arkansas Revenue Stabilization Law Of Arkansas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-02 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 55 N: 25 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-05 House Notification that HB1163 is now Act 287
2012-03-02 House Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2012-03-02 House TO BE ENROLLED
2012-03-02 House Returned From the Senate as passed.
2012-03-02 Senate Returned to the House as passed.
2012-03-02 Senate Read the third time and passed.
2012-03-02 Senate Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2012-03-01 Senate Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2012-03-01 Senate Received from the House.
2012-03-01 House CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED
2012-03-01 House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2012-02-29 House Returned by the Committee Do Pass
2012-02-28 House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2012-02-28 House Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2012-02-28 House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2012-02-23 House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2012-02-23 House Filed

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback