AR HB1139 | 2016 | 90th General Assembly Fiscal

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-06 - Notification that HB1139 is now Act 218
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Department Of Community Correction Supplemental Appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Department Of Community Correction Supplemental Appropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-03 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-06HouseNotification that HB1139 is now Act 218
2016-05-03HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2016-05-03HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2016-05-03HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2016-05-03SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2016-05-03SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2016-05-03SenateRead the third time and passed.
2016-04-28SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2016-04-28SenateReceived from the House.
2016-04-28HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2016-04-28HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2016-04-27HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2016-04-26HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2016-04-26HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback