AR HB1138 | 2016 | 90th General Assembly Fiscal

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-09 - Notification that HB1138 is now Act 269
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Secretary Of State - On-line Campaign Finance Reporting System Appropriation For The 2016-2017 Fiscal Year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Secretary Of State - On-line Campaign Finance Reporting System Appropriation For The 2016-2017 Fiscal Year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 86 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-09HouseNotification that HB1138 is now Act 269
2016-05-05HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2016-05-04HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2016-05-04HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2016-05-04SenateReturned to the House as Passed.
2016-05-04SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2016-05-04SenateRead the third time and passed.
2016-05-03SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2016-05-03SenateReceived from the House.
2016-05-03HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2016-05-03HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2016-04-27HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2016-04-26HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2016-04-26HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback