AR HB1111 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-09 - Notification that HB1111 is now Act 44
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-09 - Notification that HB1111 is now Act 44
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Age In Which Members Of Certain Plans Under The Arkansas Local Police And Fire Retirement System And Local Police And Fire Pension And Relief Funds Begin To Receive Fund Distributions.
Title
To Amend The Age In Which Members Of Certain Plans Under The Arkansas Local Police And Fire Retirement System And Local Police And Fire Pension And Relief Funds Begin To Receive Fund Distributions.
Sponsors
Rep. Les Warren [R] | Sen. Kim Hammer [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-06 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - Third Reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - Third Reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-09 | House | Notification that HB1111 is now Act 44 |
2023-02-06 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2023-02-06 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2023-02-06 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2023-01-31 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-01-30 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-01-26 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-01-26 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2023-01-26 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2023-01-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT |
2023-01-11 | House | Filed |