AR HB1106 | 2016 | 90th General Assembly Fiscal

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-09 - Notification that HB1106 is now Act 265
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Department Of Arkansas State Police Appropriation For The 2016-2017 Fiscal Year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Department Of Arkansas State Police Appropriation For The 2016-2017 Fiscal Year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-05 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-09HouseNotification that HB1106 is now Act 265
2016-05-05HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2016-05-05HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2016-05-05HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2016-05-05SenateReturned to the House as Passed.
2016-05-05SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2016-05-05SenateRead the third time and passed.
2016-05-04SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2016-05-04SenateReceived from the House.
2016-05-04HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2016-05-04HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2016-05-04HouseConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2016-05-04HouseRULES SUSPENDED
2016-05-03HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2016-04-13HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2016-03-22HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback