AR HB1096 | 2022 | 93rd General Assembly Fiscal
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-07 - Notification that HB1096 is now Act 151
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-07 - Notification that HB1096 is now Act 151
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The Department Of Transformation And Shared Services - Employee Benefits Division Commission Stipend And Mileage Appropriation.
Title
An Act For The Department Of Transformation And Shared Services - Employee Benefits Division Commission Stipend And Mileage Appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - Third Reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - Third Reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | House | Notification that HB1096 is now Act 151 |
2022-03-03 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2022-03-02 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2022-03-02 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2022-03-01 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2022-03-01 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2022-02-23 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2022-02-14 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE |
2022-02-14 | House | Filed |