AR HB1089 | 2024 | 94th General Assembly Fiscal
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Notification that HB1089 is now Act 86
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Notification that HB1089 is now Act 86
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For State Turnback For Counties And Municipalities By The Office Of The Treasurer Of State Supplemental Appropriation.
Title
An Act For State Turnback For Counties And Municipalities By The Office Of The Treasurer Of State Supplemental Appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - House - Third Reading (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - House - Third Reading (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Notification that HB1089 is now Act 86 |
2024-04-24 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2024-04-23 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2024-04-23 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Returned to the House as Passed. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2024-04-18 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2024-04-18 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2024-04-17 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2024-04-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE |
2024-04-11 | House | Filed |