AR HB1085 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-30 - Notification that HB1085 is now Act 20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Arkansas Board Of Podiatric Medicine Appropriation For The 2015-2016 Fiscal Year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Arkansas Board Of Podiatric Medicine Appropriation For The 2015-2016 Fiscal Year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-01-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-01-30HouseNotification that HB1085 is now Act 20
2015-01-27HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2015-01-27HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2015-01-27HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2015-01-27SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2015-01-27SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2015-01-27SenateRead the third time and passed.
2015-01-26SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2015-01-26SenateReceived from the House.
2015-01-26HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2015-01-26HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2015-01-22HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2015-01-20HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2015-01-20HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback