AR HB1082 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-03 - House Notification that HB1082 is now Act 156
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-03 - House Notification that HB1082 is now Act 156
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Transfer Funds To Provide For The Payment Of Reimbursement To Counties Housing State Inmates.
Title
An Act To Transfer Funds To Provide For The Payment Of Reimbursement To Counties Housing State Inmates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-28 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-03 | House Notification that HB1082 is now Act 156 | |
2011-03-01 | House Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. | |
2011-02-28 | House TO BE ENROLLED | |
2011-02-28 | House Returned From the Senate as passed. | |
2011-02-28 | Senate Returned to the House as Passed. | |
2011-02-28 | Senate EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED | |
2011-02-28 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-02-28 | Senate Rules suspended. | |
2011-02-28 | Senate Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass. | |
2011-02-24 | Senate Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. | |
2011-02-24 | Senate Received from the House. | |
2011-02-24 | House EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED | |
2011-02-24 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-02-23 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-01-10 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on Joint Budget Committee | |
2011-01-10 | House Filed |