AR HB1069 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - Notification that HB1069 is now Act 408
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - Notification that HB1069 is now Act 408
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Provisions Of The Arkansas Code Concerning The Practice Of Pharmacy; And To Authorize Pharmacists To Provide Access To And Administration Of Oral Contraceptives.
Title
To Amend The Provisions Of The Arkansas Code Concerning The Practice Of Pharmacy; And To Authorize Pharmacists To Provide Access To And Administration Of Oral Contraceptives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Third Reading (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Third Reading (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | House | Notification that HB1069 is now Act 408 |
2021-03-18 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-03-17 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-03-17 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-03-08 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-04 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-02-22 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-02-22 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-02-22 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-01-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2020-12-31 | House | Filed |