AR HB1069 | 2012 | 88th General Assembly Fiscal

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-05 - House Notification that HB1069 is now Act 278
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Department Of Human Services - Division Of County Operations Appropriation For The 2012-2013 Fiscal Year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Department Of Human Services - Division Of County Operations Appropriation For The 2012-2013 Fiscal Year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-05 House Notification that HB1069 is now Act 278
2012-03-02 House Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2012-03-01 House TO BE ENROLLED
2012-03-01 House Returned From the Senate as passed.
2012-03-01 Senate Returned to the House as Passed.
2012-03-01 Senate EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2012-03-01 Senate Read the third time and passed.
2012-03-01 Senate Rules suspended.
2012-03-01 Senate Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2012-02-29 Senate Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2012-02-29 Senate Received from the House.
2012-02-29 House EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2012-02-29 House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2012-02-29 House Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2012-02-29 House RULES SUSPENDED
2012-02-28 House Returned by the Committee Do Pass
2012-02-13 House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2012-02-08 House Prefiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback