AR HB1058 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-24 - Notification that HB1058 is now Act 5
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Definition Of "written Certification" Within The Arkansas Medical Marijuana Amendment Of 2016; And To Specify That An Application For A Registry Identification Card Is Not A Medical Record.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Definition Of "written Certification" Within The Arkansas Medical Marijuana Amendment Of 2016; And To Specify That An Application For A Registry Identification Card Is Not A Medical Record.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-01-23 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 70 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-24HouseNotification that HB1058 is now Act 5
2017-01-23HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2017-01-23HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2017-01-23HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2017-01-23SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2017-01-23SenateRead the third time and passed.
2017-01-18SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2017-01-17SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor
2017-01-17SenateReceived from the House.
2017-01-17HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2017-01-11HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2017-01-09HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
2016-12-27HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback