AR HB1047 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 41-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Notification that HB1047 is now Act 633
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Require That A Voter Provide Verification Of Voter Registration When Voting; And To Amend Amendment 51 Of The Arkansas Constitution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Require That A Voter Provide Verification Of Voter Registration When Voting; And To Amend Amendment 51 Of The Arkansas Constitution.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-20 - House - Senate amendment # 2 read and concurred in. (Y: 73 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 74 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 74 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - Motion to suspend rule of fiscal impact passed. (Y: 69 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-24HouseNotification that HB1047 is now Act 633
2017-03-21HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2017-03-20HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2017-03-20HouseSenate amendment # 2 read and concurred in.
2017-03-20HouseSenate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2017-03-15HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 & 2
2017-03-08HouseRe-referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2017-03-08HouseReturned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 & 2
2017-03-08SenateReturned To the House as passed as amended.
2017-03-08SenateRead the third time and passed.
2017-03-06SenateThe vote by which HB 1047 FAILED of adoption was EXPUNGED.
2017-03-06SenateRead the third time and failed.
2017-03-02SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2017-02-28SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
2017-02-28SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-02-28SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2017-02-28SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
2017-02-27SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
2017-02-21SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2017-02-20SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
2017-02-20SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-02-20SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2017-02-20SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2017-01-31SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
2017-01-31SenateReceived from the House.
2017-01-31HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2017-01-31HouseMotion for immediate consideraton passed.
2017-01-31HouseMotion to suspend rule of fiscal impact passed.
2017-01-25HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2017-01-20HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-01-20HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2017-01-20HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2017-01-09HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2016-12-13HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HB1047
Texthttp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Bills/HB1047.pdf
Texthttp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Acts/Act633.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Pages/votes.aspx?rcsnum=185&votechamber=House
Roll Callhttp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Pages/votes.aspx?rcsnum=186&votechamber=House
Roll Callhttp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Pages/votes.aspx?rcsnum=685&votechamber=Senate
Roll Callhttp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Pages/votes.aspx?rcsnum=739&votechamber=Senate
Roll Callhttp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Pages/votes.aspx?rcsnum=1019&votechamber=House
Roll Callhttp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Pages/votes.aspx?rcsnum=1020&votechamber=House

Bill Comments

feedback