AR HB1039 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Definition Of "employer" Under The Arkansas Income Tax Withholding Act Of 1965.
Title
To Amend The Definition Of "employer" Under The Arkansas Income Tax Withholding Act Of 1965.
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Milligan [R] | Rep. Logan Jett [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - Third Reading (Y: 87 N: 3 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | Senate | Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-04-07 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-06 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-03-17 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-17 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-01-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2020-12-17 | House | Filed |