AR HB1033 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-26 - Notification that HB1033 is now Act 6
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Arkansas Board Of Dispensing Opticians Appropriation For The 2015-2016 Fiscal Year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Arkansas Board Of Dispensing Opticians Appropriation For The 2015-2016 Fiscal Year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-01-22 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-01-26HouseNotification that HB1033 is now Act 6
2015-01-22HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2015-01-22HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2015-01-22HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2015-01-22SenateReturned to the House as Passed.
2015-01-22SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2015-01-22SenateRead the third time and passed.
2015-01-21SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2015-01-21SenateReceived from the House.
2015-01-21HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2015-01-21HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2015-01-21HouseConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2015-01-21HouseRULES SUSPENDED
2015-01-15HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2015-01-12HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2015-01-07HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback