AR HB1026 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - Returned by the Committee Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Arkansas Medical Marijuana Amendment Of 2016 Regarding The Dates For Rulemaking And The Date To Begin Accepting Applications For Dispensaries And Cultivation Facilities; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Arkansas Medical Marijuana Amendment Of 2016 Regarding The Dates For Rulemaking And The Date To Begin Accepting Applications For Dispensaries And Cultivation Facilities; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-01-19 - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-17HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2017-01-24HouseNotification that HB1026 is now Act 4
2017-01-19HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2017-01-19HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2017-01-19HouseSenate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2017-01-19HouseReturned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2017-01-19SenateReturned To the House as passed as amended.
2017-01-19SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2017-01-19SenateRead the third time and passed.
2017-01-19SenateRules suspended.
2017-01-19SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-01-19SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2017-01-19SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2017-01-18SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2017-01-17SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor
2017-01-17SenateReceived from the House.
2017-01-17HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2017-01-17HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2017-01-11HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2017-01-09HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
2016-11-30HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback